Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/09/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/09/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/09/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/13/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/13/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/13/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/13/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/15/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/15/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/15/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/15/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/19/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/19/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/21/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/22/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/22/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 05/22/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/22/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/23/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/23/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/27/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/30/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/09/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/09/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 06/11/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/11/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/23/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/23/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/23/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/23/2014