There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Orphan County Telecommunications Rights Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for greater access to in-State television broadcast programming, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/09/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
07/21/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/16/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/2014Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2014Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/18/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/09/2014 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology05/16/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary05/09/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet07/21/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4635.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4635. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/09/2014)

Orphan County Telecommunications Rights Act of 2014 - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to permit an adjacent underserved county of a television broadcast station to file a petition with the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to be included in the local market of such station.

Defines "adjacent underserved county" as a county within a television broadcast station's adjacent market that is: (1) located in the same state as the station's community of license, and (2) not within the local market of any other station that is affiliated with the same television network and located in the same state.

Defines "adjacent market" as any designated market area adjacent to, and partially but not entirely in the same state as, the designated market area in which the station's community of license is located. Requires a county that is not within the local or adjacent market of any network station licensed to a community in the county's state to be considered within the adjacent market of any station licensed to a community in the nearest designated market area: (1) that is located in whole or in part within such state, and (2) with respect to which the community of license of at least one network station is located both in such designated market area and in such state.

Allows the FCC to determine that a particular county is part of the local market of more than one television broadcast station affiliated with the same television network.

Prohibits a multichannel video programming distributor, during the pendency of a proceeding on a county's petition for inclusion in the local market of a television broadcast station, from deleting the signal of a station that: (1) is affiliated with the same television network, and (2) has a local market that includes such county.

Directs the FCC, if the local market of a television broadcast station is modified to include a petitioning county, to include within the television market of such station all of the communities within such county for purposes of carriage obligation requirements under which cable operators carry the signals of local commercial television stations. Requires the FCC's modification of a station's local market under this Act to also result in a modification of such marketfor purposes of statutory licensing requirements that apply to secondary transmissions of local television programming by satellite.