Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/09/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/13/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/13/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/13/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/13/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/13/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/15/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/15/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/15/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/15/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/15/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/15/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/20/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/20/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/21/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/21/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/21/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/23/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/28/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/17/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/17/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/17/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/17/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/18/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/10/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/10/2014