There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States Commission on International Religious Freedom Reauthorization Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Commission on International Religious Freedom Reauthorization Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the United States Commission on International Religious Freedom, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/08/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5836)
05/09/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
07/09/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/08/2014-4:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5836)
07/08/2014-3:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4653.
07/08/2014-3:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5836-5839)
07/08/2014-3:44pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/26/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
06/26/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/18/2014HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent .
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations
06/18/2014HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations
06/04/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/09/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/09/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/19/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/19/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/20/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/22/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/09/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/10/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/10/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/12/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/17/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/18/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/19/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/25/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/25/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/26/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/08/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/09/2014 Referred to
06/26/2014 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations06/04/2014 Referred to
06/18/2014 Markup by
06/18/2014 Reported by
Senate Foreign Relations07/09/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4653. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/08/2014)

United States Commission on International Religious Freedom Reauthorization Act of 2014 - Amends the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 to reauthorize the U.S. Commission on International Religious Freedom (USCIRF) as an independent federal government advisory body through FY2019.

(Sec. 2) Requires USCIRF as a whole to have expertise on the variety of faiths practiced around the world.

Requires appointments to USCIRF to be made within 90 days of a vacancy. Removes authority under which a USCIRF member may serve after the expiration of that member's term until a successor has taken office.

(Sec. 3) Amends the Foreign Service Act of 1980 to require the Secretary of State to receive assistance from USCIRF when establishing training for Foreign Service officers in the field of internationally recognized human rights, including instruction regarding the relationship between religious freedom and security, as well as the role of religious freedom in U.S. foreign policy.

(Sec. 4) Encourages the Department of State to allow classified information to be accessed by USCIRF Commissioners and staff with the appropriate security clearance.

Requires discrimination on the basis of religion to be treated as a category of employment discrimination for purposes of the employment protections for USCIRF employees.

(Sec. 5) Revises restrictions on USCIRF's acceptance of gifts and donations to permit sponsoring private parties to provide compensation and benefits to interns, fellows, and volunteers. Requires the number, duration, and funding source of any such internship, fellowship, or volunteer programs to be described in USCIRF's annual financial report.

(Sec. 6) Terminates USCIRF on September 30, 2019.