Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/19/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/19/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/20/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/22/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/09/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/10/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/10/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/12/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/17/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/18/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/19/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/25/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/25/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/26/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/08/2014