Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/15/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/15/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/19/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/21/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/21/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/21/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/27/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/27/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/28/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/29/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/29/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/30/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/30/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/30/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/30/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/09/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/09/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/09/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/17/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/17/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/17/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/17/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/22/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/23/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/12/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/12/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/13/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/02/2014