There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Point Spencer Coast Guard and Public-Private Sector Infrastructure Development Facilitation and Land Conveyance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the retention and future use of certain land on Point Spencer in Alaska, to support the statutory missions and duties of the Coast Guard, to convey certain land on Point Spencer to the Bering Straits Native Corporation, to convey certain land on Point Spencer to the State of Alaska, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/15/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
11/19/2014Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/2014Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/19/2014Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
11/19/2014Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
09/10/2014Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs
05/28/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/28/2014Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/16/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/15/2014Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2014Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2014Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E756-757)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 05/15/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/15/2014 Referred to
11/19/2014 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs05/28/2014 Referred to
09/10/2014 Hearings by
11/19/2014 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation05/28/2014 Referred to
11/19/2014 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/15/2014 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation05/16/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4668.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4668. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/15/2014)

Point Spencer Coast Guard and Public-Private Sector Infrastructure Development Facilitation and Land Conveyance Act - Designates certain land at Point Spencer in Alaska (a parcel of land on which a decommissioned long range radio navigation station was located) to be: (1) retained by the Coast Guard; (2) conveyed to, or leased by, the state of Alaska; and (3) conveyed to the Bering Straits Native Corporation (BSNC) (a corporation authorized to represent and manage land and resources from the settlement of aboriginal claims of indigenous Alaska Natives in the Bering Strait region).

Requires the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard is operating to retain an easement authorizing public aircraft to use all existing and future airstrips, runways, and taxiways on a specified tract of such land at no cost.

Defines "public aircraft" as any aircraft owned by, operated by, or chartered by the United States or by a contractor of the United States for the performance of a federal contract on or from Point Spencer.

Sets forth requirements concerning: (1) conveyed lands that are leased back to the Coast Guard upon the Secretary's request, (2) airspace easements, and (3) rights-of-way on roads to and from airstrips.

Requires the United States to retain the authority to enforce archaeological and historic preservation laws on certain land.

Directs the Secretary, the state of Alaska, and the BSNC to develop a joint management plan for the use and management of the lands retained, conveyed, or leased under this Act.