Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/20/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/20/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 05/20/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/20/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/20/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/20/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/20/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/20/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/20/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/11/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/30/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/30/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/22/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/09/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/09/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/09/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/09/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/09/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/09/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/16/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/16/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/18/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/12/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/12/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/20/2014