Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/21/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/23/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/23/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/09/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/09/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/09/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/09/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/24/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/15/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/16/2014