Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/09/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/20/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/24/2014