Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/21/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/15/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/15/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/2014