Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 05/22/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/22/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/29/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/12/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/29/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/15/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/18/2014