Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/22/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/28/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/05/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/11/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/11/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/11/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/12/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/18/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/25/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/03/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/30/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/31/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/01/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/08/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/08/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/15/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/12/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/14/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/19/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/02/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/11/2014