There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

America Gives More Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to House

Fighting Hunger Incentive Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Fighting Hunger Incentive Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently extend and expand the charitable deduction for contributions of food inventory.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/17/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 277 - 130 (Roll no. 432).(text: CR H6364-6365)
06/26/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 113-498.
05/22/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
07/23/2014SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477.
07/22/2014SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
07/17/2014-12:42pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 277 - 130 (Roll no. 432). (text: CR H6364-6365)
07/17/2014-12:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2014-12:35pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 185 - 227 (Roll no. 431). (consideration: CR H6377-4378)
07/17/2014-12:06pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H6377)
07/17/2014-11:58amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Van Hollen motion to recommit with instructions pending a reseravation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported to the House with an amendment to extend the three existing charitable tax extenders and two new charitable tax provisions in the underlying bill for only two additional years, through the end of 2015, as opposed to the permanent extension costing $16 billion in the underlying bill. It would prevent these five tax cuts from permanently adding to the deficit, undermining comprehensive tax reform, and putting further pressure on the United States discretionary priorities. Additionally, the motion would deny any claiming of these five charitable tax provisions by inverted corporations that change their residence from the United States in order to avoid paying U.S. taxes. Subsequently, the point of order was withdrawn.
07/17/2014-11:58amHouseMr. Van Hollen moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Ways and Means. (consideration: CR H6375-6378; text: CR H6375-6376)
07/17/2014-11:57amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6375)
07/17/2014-10:51amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4719.
07/17/2014-10:50amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4719 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The rule provides that the amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 113-51 shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended, shall be considered as read.
07/17/2014-10:50amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 670. (consideration: CR H6364-6378)
07/17/2014-10:40amHouseRule H. Res. 670 passed House.
07/15/2014-5:21pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 670 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4719 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The rule provides that the amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 113-51 shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended, shall be considered as read.
06/26/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 371.
06/26/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 113-498.
05/29/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 13.
05/29/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/22/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
05/22/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/22/2014 Referred to
05/29/2014 Markup by
06/26/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-498

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4719. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/17/2014)

America Gives More Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) make permanent the enhanced tax deduction for charitable contributions of food inventory; (2) increase from 10% to 15% of the aggregate net income of taxpayers other than C corporations the amount of deductible food inventory contributions which such taxpayers may make in any taxable year (for a C corporation, 15% of its taxable income); (3) permit a taxpayer who is not required to account for inventories or capitalize indirect costs, to elect, solely for purposes of computing the amount of the deduction, to treat the basis of any apparently wholesome food (as defined in the Bill Emerson Good Samaritan Food Donation Act) as equal to 25% of the fair market value of such food; and (4) set forth a formula for determining the fair market value of such food.

Makes permanent: (1) tax-free distributions from individual retirement accounts (IRAs) for charitable purposes, and (2) the tax deduction for charitable contributions by individuals and corporations of real property interests for conservation purposes.

Allows taxpayers to treat a charitable contribution made after the close of the taxable year but before the due date of the tax return as being made in such taxable year.

Reduces from 2% to 1% the excise tax rate on the net investment income of tax-exempt private foundations. Repeals the 1% reduction in such tax rate for private foundations that meet certain distribution requirements.

Prohibits the entry of the budgetary effects of this Act on any PAYGO (pay-as-you-go) scorecard.