Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/22/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/29/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/09/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/19/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 11/19/2014