Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/24/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/07/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/30/2013