Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/09/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/15/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/22/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/18/2014