There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program under which eligible veterans may elect to receive hospital care and medical services at non-Department of Veterans Affairs facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/29/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/16/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/29/2014Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/29/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/09/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/30/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/29/2014 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/16/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4759.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4759. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/29/2014)

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a two-year pilot program under which: (1) eligible veterans may elect to receive hospital care and services at non-Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) facilities, and (2) the Secretary shall reimburse such facilities for the cost of such care and services.

Defines an "eligible veteran" as a veteran who: (1) is enrolled in the VA's patient enrollment system, and (2) resides in a geographic area selected by the Secretary. Directs the Secretary to select: (1) one geographic area within each Veterans Integrated Service Network, and (2) NJ-2 as the geographic area for participation in the pilot program for Veterans Integrated Service Network 4.

Requires the Secretary to: (1) issue a unique identification card to each eligible veteran who elects to receive hospital care and medical services at non-VA facilities under the pilot program, and (2) take steps to ensure that such veterans receive such care and services at such non-VA facilities.