Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/29/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/30/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/23/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/12/2014