Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/05/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/09/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/09/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/18/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/18/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/25/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/30/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/30/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/11/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/08/2014