Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/16/2014