Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/30/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/30/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/09/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/09/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/09/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/09/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/10/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/11/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/11/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/12/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/17/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/17/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/20/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/23/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/25/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/18/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/31/2014