Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/18/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/23/2014