Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/05/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/17/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/18/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/13/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/09/2014