Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/30/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 05/30/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/09/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/11/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/11/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/11/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/18/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/25/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/26/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 06/26/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/26/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/08/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/29/2014