There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to include the cost of applying to an institution of higher learning as part of the benefits provided under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/30/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/16/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/30/2014Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/30/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 05/30/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/22/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/23/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/24/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/24/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/25/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/25/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/25/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/25/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/29/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/29/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/29/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/29/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/29/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/29/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/30/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/30/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/31/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/31/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 08/01/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/10/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/10/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/10/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/16/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/16/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/16/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/16/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/18/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/13/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/13/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 11/13/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/13/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/13/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/13/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/13/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/13/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/13/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/13/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/13/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/13/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/13/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/13/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/14/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/14/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/19/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/19/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 11/19/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/04/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 12/04/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/04/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/04/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 12/04/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 12/04/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/04/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/04/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/10/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/11/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/11/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/11/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/11/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/30/2014 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity06/16/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4793.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4793. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/30/2014)

Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2014 - Makes an individual who is eligible for educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance program eligible for assistance with the fees for applying to institutions of higher education (IHEs).

Sets the amount of such assistance payable to an individual at the lesser of: (1) the total application fees charged to the individual by the IHEs, or (2) $750.