There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to House

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Airport Security Enhancement Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve intergovernmental planning for and communication during security incidents at domestic airports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/22/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6607)
07/03/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-512.
06/05/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/23/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/22/2014-4:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/22/2014-4:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6607)
07/22/2014-4:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4802.
07/22/2014-4:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6606-6609)
07/22/2014-4:20pmHouseMr. Hudson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/03/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384.
07/03/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-512.
06/11/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/11/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/11/2014HouseSubcommittee on Transportation Security Discharged.
06/09/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/05/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
06/05/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/25/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/05/2014 Referred to
06/11/2014 Markup by
07/03/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-512
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation Security06/09/2014 Referred to
06/11/2014 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/23/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4802.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4802. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/22/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 3, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2014 - (Sec. 3) Directs the Assistant Secretary of Homeland Security (Transportation Security) of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) conduct outreach to all U.S. airports at which the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) performs, or oversees the implementation and performance of, security measures; and (2) give necessary technical assistance to verify that such airports have in place individualized working plans for responding to security incidents inside the airport perimeter, including active shooters, acts of terrorism, and incidents that target passenger-screening checkpoints.

Requires the Assistant Secretary to report to Congress on the outreach findings, including an analysis of the level of preparedness such airports have to respond to such incidents.

(Sec. 4) Requires the Assistant Secretary to: (1) identify best practices that exist across airports for security incident planning, management, and training; and (2) establish a mechanism through which to share those best practices with other airport operators nationwide.

(Sec. 5) Requires the Assistant Secretary also to: (1) certify annually to specified congressional committees that all screening personnel have participated in practical training exercises for active shooter scenarios, and (2) analyze for those same committees how TSA can use cost savings achieved through efficiencies to increase over the next five fiscal years the funding available for checkpoint screening law enforcement support reimbursable agreements.

(Sec. 7) Declares that no additional appropriations are authorized to carry out this Act. Requires this Act to be carried out using amounts otherwise available.

(Sec. 8) Requires the Assistant Secretary to review the interoperable communications capabilities of law enforcement, fire, and medical personnel responsible for responding to security incidents at all U.S. airports at which the TSA performs, or oversees the implementation and performance of, security measures.