There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

TSA Office of Inspection Accountability Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to House

TSA Office of Inspection Accountability Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

TSA Office of Inspection Accountability Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Transportation Security Administration to conform to existing Federal law and regulations regarding criminal investigator positions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/22/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6604-6605)
07/03/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-513.
06/05/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/23/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/22/2014-4:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/22/2014-4:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6604-6605)
07/22/2014-4:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4803.
07/22/2014-4:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6604-6606)
07/22/2014-4:08pmHouseMr. Sanford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/03/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385.
07/03/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-513.
06/11/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/11/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/11/2014HouseSubcommittee on Transportation Security Discharged.
06/09/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/05/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
06/05/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 06/05/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/10/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/05/2014 Referred to
06/11/2014 Markup by
07/03/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-513
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation Security06/09/2014 Referred to
06/11/2014 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/23/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4803.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4803. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/22/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 3, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

TSA Office of Inspection Accountability Act of 2014 - (Sec. 4) Directs the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) analyze the data and methods that the Assistant Secretary of Homeland Security (Transportation Security) uses to identify Transportation Security Administration (TSA) law enforcement officer and criminal investigators; and (2) provide relevant findings to the Assistant Secretary, including regarding whether the data and methods are adequate and valid.

Prohibits TSA from hiring any new employee to work in its Office of Inspection if the Inspector General finds that such data and methods are inadequate or invalid, until: (1) the Assistant Secretary makes a certification to the House Committee on Homeland Security and the Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation that only TSA employees who meet such requirements are classified as criminal investigators and are receiving premium pay and other benefits associated with such classification; and (2) the Inspector General submits a finding that the Assistant Secretary utilized adequate and valid data and methods to make such certification.

(Sec. 5) Directs the Assistant Secretary to: (1) reclassify criminal investigator positions in the Office of Inspection as noncriminal investigator positions or non-law enforcement positions if the individuals in those positions do not, or are not expected to, spend an average of at least 50% of their time performing criminal investigative duties; and (2) estimate the total long-term cost savings to the federal government resulting from such reclassification and provide such estimate to such committees. Requires such estimate to identify savings associated with the positions reclassified, including savings from: law enforcement training, early retirement benefits, law enforcement availability pay, weapons, vehicles, and communications devices.

(Sec. 6) Directs the Assistant Secretary to submit to such committees: (1) any materials in the possession or control of DHS associated with the Office of Inspection's review of the use of a federal firearms license by Federal Air Marshal Service officials to obtain discounted or free firearms for personal use; and (2) information on specific actions that will be taken to prevent Service officials from using a federal firearms license, or exploiting the Service's relationships with private vendors, to obtain discounted or free firearms for personal use.