There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Defense Production Act, to improve the Defense Production Act Committee, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
09/26/2014Became Public Law No: 113-172. (TXT | PDF)
09/26/2014Signed by President.
09/19/2014Presented to President.
09/17/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5720)
07/29/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 32 (Roll no. 464).(text: CR H7002)
06/09/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/26/2014Became Public Law No: 113-172. (TXT | PDF)
09/26/2014Signed by President.
09/19/2014HousePresented to President.
09/18/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/17/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5720)
07/30/2014SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/29/2014-5:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 32 (Roll no. 464). (text: CR H7002)
07/29/2014-5:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2014-5:42pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7024)
07/29/2014-2:36pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/29/2014-2:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4809.
07/29/2014-2:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7002-7004)
07/29/2014-2:18pmHouseMr. Campbell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/11/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/11/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/09/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
06/09/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/09/2014 Referred to
06/11/2014 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4809.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4809. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-172 (09/26/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 29, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) Reauthorizes provisions of the Defense Production Act of 1950 (provides authority for the President and federal agencies to prepare for national defense, military conflicts, disasters, or acts of terrorism using the domestic industrial base to supply materials and services) through September 30, 2019.

Reinstates authorities under which the President may provide for loans to private business enterprises or authorize a guaranteeing agency to guarantee loans by private institutions to contractors, providers of critical infrastructure, or other persons for services, production, or deliveries essential to national defense. Makes such authorities effective for any fiscal year only to such extent or in such amounts as are provided in advance in appropriations Acts.

(Sec. 2) Revises requirements relating to the Defense Production Act Committee to: (1) direct the Committee to coordinate and plan (currently, advise the President) according to specified priorities and allocation authorities; (2) require the Chairperson to be the head of the agency to which the President has delegated primary responsibility for government-wide coordination of such activities; and (3) require the Chairperson to appoint a coordinator of Committee activities (currently, the President appoints an Executive Director).

Expands the Committee's annual report to Congress to include a description of contingency planning by federal agencies, legislative recommendations, and updated copies of federal agencies' rules to promote national defense under both emergency and nonemergency conditions.

(Sec. 3) Requires federal agencies delegated defense production authority to review such rules annually and make updates whenever appropriate.

(Sec. 4) Prohibits the President from: (1) delegating a determination to execute a contract for an industrial resource, material, or critical technology that is essential to national defense; (2) executing contracts for such capabilities unless the purchases are the most cost effective, expedient, and practical alternative method for meeting the need; and (3) taking action to correct an industrial resource shortfall without congressional authorization if such action would cause the aggregate outstanding amount of all such actions to exceed $50 million.

Prohibits the congressional authorization requirement for an aggregate amount exceeding $50 million from applying to projects undertaken pursuant to a determination made before the enactment of this Act.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes specified appropriations.