Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/11/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/11/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/16/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/09/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/12/2013