Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 06/09/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/09/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/11/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/11/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/12/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/19/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/26/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/18/2014