There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the understanding of, and promote access to treatment for, chronic kidney disease, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/09/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/13/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/09/2014Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/2014Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/10/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/25/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/25/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/28/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/10/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/10/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/10/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/10/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/10/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/10/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/10/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/15/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/15/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/19/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/19/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/01/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/01/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/09/2014 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/13/2014 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/09/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4814.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4814. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/09/2014)

Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2014 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to revise Medicare payments for dialysis services provided to individuals with end stage renal disease (ESRD) and acute kidney injury. Extends the time period when a private health insurer, in determining benefits, cannot consider a group health insurance enrollee's ESRD or entitlement to Medicare coverage due to ESRD. Makes individuals with ESRD eligible for Medicare Advantage.

Allows dialysis facilities to provide kidney disease education services and allows physician assistants, nurse practitioners, or clinical nurse specialists to refer individuals to those services.

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish an ESRD Care Coordination program to provide higher Medicare payments to nephrologists, dialysis facilities, and other providers that reduce spending on ESRD by being part of a coordinated care organization.

Amends the Public Health Service Act to include dialysis as a service provided by the National Health Service Corps in health professional shortage areas. Makes nephrologists and non-physician practitioners who provide dialysis eligible for the National Health Service Corps Scholarship Program and Loan Repayment Program.

Requires the Comptroller General (GAO) to submit a report identifying gaps in chronic kidney disease research and comparing research funding to expenditures on disease treatment. Requires HHS to study the causes of kidney disease and efforts to treat kidney disease in disproportionately affected minority populations.