Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/09/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/10/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/25/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/25/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/28/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/10/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/10/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/10/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/10/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/10/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/10/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/10/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/15/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/15/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/19/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/19/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/01/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/01/2014