Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/26/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 02/25/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/20/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/01/2014