Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/06/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/06/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 02/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/06/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/06/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/06/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/06/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/06/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/06/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/06/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 02/06/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/06/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/13/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/13/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/13/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/15/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/07/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/07/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/07/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 03/07/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/08/2013