Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/10/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/25/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/25/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/11/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/23/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/15/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/10/2014