There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate the railroad station located at 2955 Market Street in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, commonly known as "30th Street Station", as the "William H. Gray III 30th Street Station".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/08/2014Became Public Law No: 113-158. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2014Signed by President.
08/04/2014Presented to President.
07/31/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5312)
07/31/2014Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/28/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6868)
06/11/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/08/2014Became Public Law No: 113-158. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2014Signed by President.
08/04/2014HousePresented to President.
08/01/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/31/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5312)
07/31/2014SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/29/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/28/2014-2:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2014-2:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6868)
07/28/2014-2:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4838.
07/28/2014-2:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6868-6870)
07/28/2014-2:21pmHouseMr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/12/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/11/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/11/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/11/2014 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials06/12/2014 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/29/2014 Referred to
07/31/2014 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4838. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-158 (08/08/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the railroad station located at 2955 Market Street in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, commonly known as 30th Street Station, as the "William H. Gray III 30th Street Station."