There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Nurse Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the position of National Nurse for Public Health, to be filled by the same individual serving as the Chief Nurse Officer of the Public Health Service.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/04/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/04/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/06/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/20/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/17/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/19/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/16/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/20/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 09/11/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/26/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/18/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/18/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/09/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/20/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/18/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/04/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/08/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.485. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2013)

National Nurse Act of 2013 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to establish the position of National Nurse for Public Health within the Office of the Surgeon General. Requires the individual serving as the National Nurse for Public Health to serve also as the Chief Nurse Officer of the Public Health Service. Includes among the duties of such position providing leadership and coordination of Public Health Service nursing professional affairs for the Office of the Surgeon General and other agencies of the Public Health Service, conducting media campaigns, and providing guidance and leadership for activities that will increase public safety and emergency preparedness.

Requires the National Nurse for Public Health to: (1) participate in identification of national health priorities, (2) encourage volunteerism of nurses and strengthen the relationship between government agencies and health-related national organizations, and (3) promote the dissemination of evidence-based practice in educating the public on health promotion and disease prevention activities.