Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/06/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/20/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/17/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/19/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/16/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/20/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 09/11/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/26/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/18/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/18/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/09/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/20/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/18/2014