Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 02/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/14/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/21/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 04/11/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2014