Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/23/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/25/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/16/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/16/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/04/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/10/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/12/2014