Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/25/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/24/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 06/30/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 08/01/2014