Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/02/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/08/2014