Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014