Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/02/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/12/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2014