Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/26/2014