Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/04/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/04/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/23/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/22/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/13/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/28/2014