Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/10/2013