Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/21/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/18/2014