Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/23/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/28/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/2014